SC H3485 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 12-6-3535, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To An Income Tax Credit For Making Qualified Rehabilitation Expenditures For A Certified Historic Structure, So As To Remove A Provision Allowing The Department Of Archives And History To Establish Fees, To Provide That A Taxpayer Claiming The Credit Must Pay A Fee To The Department Of Archives And History For The State Historic Preservation Grant Fund, And To Provide That The Department Shall Develop An Application Process; And To Amend Section 12-6-5060, Relating To Voluntary Contributions Made By An Individual By Means Of The Income Tax Return Check Off, So As To Add The Department Of Archives And History. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Archives and history, fees for certifying historic rehabilitation tax credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - House - House: Adopt Conference Report (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Conference Report (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 0 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-08 - House - House: Adopt Amendment 1a Amendment Number 1a (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 28) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 Signed By Governor
2020-09-25 Ratified R 173
2020-09-23SenateOrdered enrolled for ratification
2020-09-23SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2020-09-23SenateConference report adopted
2020-09-23HouseRoll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
2020-09-23HouseConference report received and adopted
2020-09-22SenateConference committee appointed Cromer, Nicholson, Gregory
2020-09-22HouseHouse insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Reps. W. Newton, R. Williams, and Jefferson
2020-09-16SenateRoll call Ayes-0 Nays-41
2020-09-16SenateNon-concurrence in House amendment
2020-04-08HouseRoll call Yeas-107 Nays-0
2020-04-08HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2020-04-08HouseSenate amendment amended
2020-03-10SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2020-03-05 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-04SenateRoll call Ayes-46 Nays-0
2020-03-04SenateRead second time
2020-03-04SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-02-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-02-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2019-04-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-09HouseRoll call Yeas-67 Nays-22
2019-04-09HouseRead second time
2019-04-09HouseAmended
2019-04-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-03-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
2019-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1263535(n/a)See Bill Text
1265060(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3485&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20190109.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20190327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20190409.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20190410.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20200205.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20200206.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20200304.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20200305.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20200408.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3485_20200923.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16340
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17354
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17659
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=17882
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18035
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18086

Bill Comments

feedback