SC H3483 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Repeal Section 3 Of Act 138 Of 2016 Relating To The Automatic Repeal Of Statutory Provisions Requiring Certain Coal Combustion Residuals Be Placed In A Class 3 Landfill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatic repeal of statutory provisions requiring certain coal combustion residuals to be placed in class 3 landfill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Act No. 27
2019-05-03 Effective date 04/26/19
2019-04-26 Signed By Governor
2019-04-25 Ratified R 40
2019-04-11SenateRead third time and enrolled
2019-04-10SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2019-04-10SenateRead second time
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2019-02-20SenateReferred to Subcommittee: McElveen (ch), Gambrell, Rice
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-07HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-02-06HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2019-02-06HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Forrest, Caskey
2019-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary, Collins
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback