SC H3483 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, Whitmire, Sandifer, Cobb-Hunter
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That A Person That Unlawfully Injures A Health Care Professional Including, But Not Limited To, An Emergency Medical Service Provider, A Firefighter, An Emergency Room Physician, An Emergency Room Nurse, Or An Allied Health Care Worker During The Course Of His Duties And The Injuring Person Knows Or Has Reason To Know Of The Injured Person's Status Commits The Offense Of Assault And Battery Of A High And Aggravated Nature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault and Battery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, Whitmire, Sandifer, Cobb-Hunter
2017-04-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Douglas
2017-01-26HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: V.S.Moss
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S1066 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S1096 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Referred to Subcommittee: Turner (ch), Malloy, Kimpson, Climer, Goldfinch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
163600(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback