SC H3478 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Anthony
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Require Student Participation In Certain Statewide Testing, To Provide The Testing Must Be Conducted By A Certified School District Employee Either With Public School Students In A Public School Or Optionally At The Home School Of The Student, To Provide A Parent Who Opts For A Home School Student To Take The Statewide Test At Home Must Pay For The Administration Of The Test, To Provide The State Department Of Education Annually Must Report Results Of The Mandatory Annual Review Of These Home School Associations To The General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards for home schooling programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-20HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Anthony
2013-02-19HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Horne
2013-02-07HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Jefferson
2013-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2013-02-05HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
596540(n/a)See Bill Text
596545(n/a)See Bill Text
596547(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback