SC H3476 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Pope, Daning, Nanney, Spires, Wood, Allison
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Pope, Daning, Nanney, Spires, Wood, Allison
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Bank Is Administered By The Commission Of The Department Of Transportation, To Eliminate Its Board Of Directors, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "qualified Project", To Provide That A Project May Not Be Designated As An Eligible Project For Purposes Of Bank Funding In Advance Of The Current Availability Of Funding For The Completion Of That Specific Project, And To Revise The Criteria That Must Be Used In Making A Determination Whether An Eligible Project Is A Qualified Project.
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Bank
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Pope, Daning, Nanney, Spires, Wood, Allison |
2013-02-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Finlay, W.J.McLeod |
2013-02-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pitts |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0209 (Similar To) 2013-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 43 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 180 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 540 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 560 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3476&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/3476_20130131.htm |