SC H3474 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-12 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence SJ-14

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO INVITE THE CHIEF JUSTICE OF THE SOUTH CAROLINA SUPREME COURT, THE HONORABLE JEAN HOEFER TOAL, TO ADDRESS THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY IN JOINT SESSION ON THE STATE OF THE JUDICIARY AT 12:00 NOON ON WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 25, 2009.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Invite The Chief Justice Of The South Carolina Supreme Court, The Honorable Jean Hoefer Toal, To Address The General Assembly In Joint Session On The State Of The Judiciary At 12:00 Noon On Wednesday, February 25, 2009.

Sponsors

Rep. Paul Agnew [D]Rep. Terry Alexander [D]Sen. Karl Allen [D]Rep. Merita Allison [R]
Rep. Carl Anderson [D]Rep. Michael Anthony [D]Rep. Jimmy Bales [D]Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R]
Rep. Bruce Bannister [R]Rep. Liston Barfield [R]Rep. James Battle [D]Rep. Eric Bedingfield [R]
Rep. Kenneth Bingham [R]Rep. Don Bowen [R]Rep. William Bowers [D]Rep. Joan Brady [R]
Rep. Lester Branham [D]Rep. Curtis Brantley [D]Rep. Boyd Brown [D]Rep. Grady Brown [D]
Rep. Robert Brown [D]Rep. Harry Cato [R]Rep. Richard Chalk [R]Rep. Alan Clemmons [R]
Rep. William Clyburn [D]Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D]Rep. Derham Cole [R]Rep. Daniel Cooper [R]
Rep. Kristopher Crawford [R]Rep. Joseph Daning [R]Rep. Gregory Delleney [R]Rep. Chandra Dillard [D]
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R]Rep. Tracy Edge [R]Rep. Shannon Erickson [R]Rep. Michael Forrester [R]
Rep. Marion Frye [R]Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D]Sen. Michael Gambrell [R]Rep. Wendell Gilliard [D]
Rep. Jerry Govan [D]Rep. Carl Gullick [R]Rep. Anton Gunn [D]Rep. Daniel Hamilton [R]
Rep. Nelson Hardwick [R]Rep. Robert Harrell [R]Rep. James Harrison [R]Rep. Christopher Hart [D]
Rep. Cathy Harvin [D]Rep. Jackie Hayes [D]Rep. George Hearn [R]Rep. William Herbkersman [R]
Rep. Davey Hiott [R]Rep. Kenneth Hodges [D]Rep. Jenny Horne [R]Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D]
Rep. Leon Howard [D]Rep. Chip Huggins [R]Rep. Anne Hutto [D]Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D]
Rep. Douglas Jennings [D]Rep. Keith Kelly [R]Rep. Kenneth Kennedy [D]Rep. John King [D]
Rep. Herbert Kirsh [D]Rep. Patsy Knight [D]Rep. Harry Limehouse [R]Rep. Lanny Littlejohn [R]
Sen. Dwight Loftis [R]Rep. Deborah Long [R]Rep. Phillip Lowe [R]Rep. James Lucas [R]
Rep. David Mack [D]Rep. Joseph McEachern [D]Rep. Walton McLeod [D]Rep. James Merrill [R]
Rep. Vida Miller [D]Rep. Joey Millwood [R]Rep. Harold Mitchell [D]Rep. Dennis Moss [R]
Rep. Wendy Nanney [R]Rep. James Neal [D]Rep. Joseph Neal [D]Rep. Denny Neilson [D]
Rep. Harry Ott [D]Rep. Phillip Owens [R]Rep. Steve Parker [R]Rep. Anne Parks [D]
Rep. Lewis Pinson [R]Rep. Edward Pitts [R]Rep. Michael Pitts [R]Rep. Nikki Randhawa Haley [R]
Rep. Rex Rice [R]Rep. Todd Rutherford [D]Rep. William Sandifer [R]Rep. Timothy Scott [R]
Rep. Bakari Sellers [D]Rep. Gary Simrill [R]Rep. B.R. Skelton [R]Rep. Donald Smith [R]
Rep. Garry Smith [R]Rep. James Smith [D]Rep. James Roland Smith [R]Rep. Murrell Smith [R]
Rep. Michael Sottile [R]Rep. Kit Spires [R]Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D]Rep. James Stewart [R]
Rep. Tommy Stringer [R]Rep. Michael Thompson [R]Rep. McLain Toole [R]Rep. David Umphlett [R]
Rep. Ted Vick [D]Rep. Thad Viers [R]Rep. David Weeks [D]Rep. Jackson Whipper [D]
Rep. Brian White [R]Rep. William Whitmire [R]Rep. Robert Williams [D]Rep. Mark Willis [R]
Rep. William Wylie [R]Rep. Annette Young [R]Sen. Thomas Young [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-12 Adopted, returned to House with concurrence SJ-14
2009-02-11 Introduced, placed on calendar without reference SJ-25
2009-02-10 Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate HJ-16

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback