SC H3467 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 59-32-20, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Required Cyclical Review And Revision Of Certain Mental, Emotional, And Social Health Standards And Concepts Required Under The Comprehensive Health Education Act, So As To Provide The State Board Of Education Shall Develop Certain Grade-appropriate Instructional Units In Mental Health And Wellness Through The State Department Of Education Before September 1, 2022, To Provide The Board Shall Continue To Make Standards-aligned Instructional Materials Available To School Districts In Addition To Current Standards, And To Provide School Districts Shall Continue To Adopt Or Develop Related Curriculum Locally; And To Amend Section 59-32-30, Relating To Coursework Requirements Of The Comprehensive Health Education Act, So As To Provide Seventh Grade And Ninth Grade Students Must Be Offered One Such Unit Of Mental Health And Wellness Beginning With The 2022-2023 School Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Health Education Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.L.Johnson
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3330 (Similar To) 2021-01-26 - Scrivener's error corrected

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
593220(n/a)See Bill Text
593230(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback