SC H3463 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 59-63-100, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Nonpublic School Student Participation In Interscholastic Activities Of Public Schools, So As To Provide Limited Situations In Which Seventh Grade And Eighth Grade Students Who Attend Private Schools May Participate In High School League Sports Offered At Public High Schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interscholastic activities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0615 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Committee on Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5963100(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback