SC H3463 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That If Property Was Assessed As Agricultural Property Or As Farm Machinery And Equipment In 2016, The Property Must Continue To Be Assessed With The Same Assessment Ratio Unless A Change Of Use Occurs.
Title
Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-24 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-23 | House | Amended |
2017-03-23 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Gagnon |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |