SC H3450 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Article 6 To Chapter 5, Title 39 So As To Stop Certain Social Media Censorship, To Provide Penalties, And To Provide Exceptions.
Title
Censorship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Daning |
2021-06-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Cox |
2021-05-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2021-03-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Pope |
2021-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor, Hixon, Hiott |
2021-01-14 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: May, Magnuson |
2021-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-16 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4528 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4763 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H4763 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3450&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3450_20201216.htm |