SC H3449 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
Hearing: Mar 21 @ 8:30 am in Blatt Room 410
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That The South Carolina Department Of Agriculture Is Responsible For The Regulation Of Hemp In South Carolina In Strict Compliance With The Standards And Practices Established By The United States Department Of Agriculture; And To Repeal Sections 46-55-20 Through 46-55-60, All Relating To Industrial Hemp.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture Dept

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2019-03-20SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-03-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-14SenateRead second time
2019-03-14SenateAmended
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-26SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-22 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-22HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-02-21HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-02-21HouseRoll call Yeas-97 Nays-0
2019-02-21HouseRead second time
2019-02-21HouseAmended
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Johnson, Hardee
2019-02-20HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 2-21-19
2019-02-19 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Magnuson, Hill
2019-01-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Atkinson, Ligon
2019-01-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley, Mace
2019-01-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-01-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
2019-01-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Kirby, Forrest, Young, Hixon
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
465520(n/a)See Bill Text
465560(n/a)See Bill Text
465570(n/a)See Bill Text
485570(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3449&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190108.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190116.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190214.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190219.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190221.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190222.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190305.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190306.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190314.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3449_20190315.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15705
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16165

Bill Comments

feedback