SC H3448 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Remove The One-year Limitation On The Period During Which The Employee Is Protected From Adverse Employment Actions, And To Provide For Additional Remedies.
Title
SC Whistleblower and Public Employee Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House: Table Motion To Recommit (Y: 29 N: 72 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson |
2018-03-20 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Stavrinakis, McCoy |
2018-03-08 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2018-03-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Smith |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2018-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary |
2017-01-31 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Wheeler |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 27 | 05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 27 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 27 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 27 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |