SC H3444 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-3-21
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 7-3-10, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Creation, Composition, Powers, And Duties Of The State Election Commission, So As To Reconstitute The State Election Commission And Revise The Commission's Composition, Powers, And Duties; And To Amend Sections 7-17-70 And 7-17-220, Both Relating To Meetings Of The State Board, So As To Make Conforming Changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Election Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-3-21
2021-03-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: B.Newton
2021-02-25HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-2-21
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley
2021-02-24HouseDebate adjourned until Thur., 2-25-21
2021-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: J.E.Johnson, Brittain
2021-02-18HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-02-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton, Herbkersman
2021-02-16HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Hewitt, Bailey
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey, McGinnis
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
717220(n/a)See Bill Text
71770(n/a)See Bill Text
7310(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback