SC H3443 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 1-3-420, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Gubernatorial Proclamations Of Emergency, So As To Remove References To Public Health Emergencies; And To Amend Section 25-1-440, Relating To Powers And Duties Of The Governor During A Declared Emergency, So As To Provide That After The Elapse Of At Least Thirty Days Following The Declaration Of An Emergency By The Governor, The President Of The Senate And The Speaker Of The House May Convene Their Respective Bodies For The Purpose Of Considering Such Declaration, That The General Assembly By Concurrent Resolution, May Terminate, Alter, Amend, Or Consent To The Terms Of Any Declaration Of Emergency During This Called Session, That Should The General Assembly Not Act, Then The Terms Of The Declaration Shall Continue Until Such Time As The General Assembly Does Act, That A Governor May Not Declare Successive States Of Emergency That Have The Effect Of Reinstating, Continuing, Altering, Or Amending Any Declaration Of Emergency Addressed By The General Assembly, And That The Governor May Not Issue Additional Or Successive States Of Emergency For The Same Underlying Events Without A Substantial Change Of Circumstance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State of Emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced and read first time
2021-03-02HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2021-03-01 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-02-25HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-3
2021-02-25HouseRead second time
2021-02-25HouseAmended
2021-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Bradley
2021-02-24HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-02-23HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 2-24-21
2021-02-23HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Haddon, Burns
2021-02-18HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Davis
2021-02-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Blackwell
2021-02-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon, Hiott
2021-02-09HouseDebate adjourned until Tuesday, February 23
2021-02-04HouseDebate adjourned until Tuesday, February 9
2021-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Martin, Brittain
2021-02-02HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Elliott, B.Cox, Wooten, T.Moore, Caskey, McGinnis
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-16HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-12-16HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13420(n/a)See Bill Text
251440(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback