SC H3441 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Riley
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revise The Circumstances Upon Which A Video Recording Of These Proceedings Is Required To Be Made, The Procedures That Must Be Followed When A Video Recording Is Made, And The Circumstances That Exempt An Officer From Making A Video Recording.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DUI video recording

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Riley
2015-02-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: H.A.Crawford
2015-02-10HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Henderson, Allison, Clary, Horne, Thayer
2015-02-03HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Tallon
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-28HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5652953(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback