SC H3441 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Department Of Transportation May Mow And Maintain Roadside Vegetation Beyond Thirty Feet From The Pavement Adjacent To Portions Of Interstate Highways 126, 20, 26, And 77
Title
Department of Transportation mowing
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Ballentine [R] | Rep. Kenneth Bingham [R] | Rep. Chip Huggins [R] | Rep. Walton McLeod [D] |
Rep. Harry Ott [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Act No. 23 | |
2011-05-13 | Effective date 05/09/11 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Ratified R 43 | |
2011-04-27 | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 | |
2011-04-27 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled | |
2011-04-26 | Read third time and returned to House with amendments | |
2011-04-20 | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2 | |
2011-04-20 | Read second time | |
2011-04-20 | Amended | |
2011-04-12 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-02-04 | Read third time and sent to Senate | |
2011-02-03 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2011-02-03 | Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | Amended | |
2011-02-02 | Debate adjourned until Thursday, February 3, 2011 | |
2011-02-01 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McLeod, Ott | |
2011-01-27 | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-01-27 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ballentine | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0449 (Similar To) 2011-01-26 - Referred to Committee on Transportation