SC H3432 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Jones
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Jones
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Chapter 57 To Title 46 By Enacting The "south Carolina Right To Grow Act", To Define Necessary Terms, To Define The Applicability Of A Public Or Private Nuisance Claim Against A Farm, Farm Operation, Or Agricultural Composting Operation, To Establish The Rights And Obligations Of Municipalities In Governing A Farm, Farm Operation, Or Agricultural Composting Operation, To Enable The Department Of Agriculture To Establish Best Practices And Handle Complaints Against A Farm, Farm Operation, Or Agricultural Composting Operation, To Establish "the Agricultural Complaint Response Fund", "the South Carolina Farm Agricultural Resource Management And Sustainability Program", And "the South Carolina Working Farmland Access And Protection Program".
Title
Agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: S.Jones |
2023-01-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-01-24 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Harris |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |