SC H3420 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Create The "shingles Vaccination Study Committee" To Study Whether It Is In The Public Interest For The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Establish A Shingles Vaccination Program To Offer The Vaccination For Shingles (herpes Zoster) To Certain Persons, To Provide For Membership Of The Study Committee, To Require The Study Committee To Prepare A Report For The General Assembly, And To Include A Sunset Provision For The Study Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shingles Vaccination Study Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 73 N: 29 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-02-24HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-02-23HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2017-02-23HouseRoll call Yeas-73 Nays-29
2017-02-23HouseRead second time
2017-02-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-02-15HouseCommittee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2017-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2017-01-11HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback