SC H3420 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Include Veterans Of The Eras Encompassing The Korean War And Vietnam War.
Title
High School Diplomas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-02-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |