SC H3403 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-19-360 So As To Provide A Process For The Exemption Of Competency-based Schools From Certain Applicable Laws And Regulations, And Provide Related Requirements For Competency-based Schools, The State Department Of Education, And The Commission On Higher Education.
Title
Competency based schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-12 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-04-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read second time |
2019-04-11 | House | Amended |
2019-04-11 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-04-11 | House | Requests for debate removed-Rep |
2019-04-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bannister |
2019-04-09 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |