SC H3399 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-03 - Introduced and adopted HJ-2
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-03 - Introduced and adopted HJ-2
Summary
A HOUSE RESOLUTION TO RECOGNIZE AND CONGRATULATE THE R.C. EDWARDS MIDDLE SCHOOL BAND, OF PICKENS COUNTY, FOR CAPTURING THE OUTSTANDING CONCERT BAND AWARD AT THE PRESIDENTIAL INAUGURAL HERITAGE BAND FESTIVAL, HELD ON JANUARY 18, 2009, IN BALTIMORE, MARYLAND.
Title
Recognize And Congratulate The R.c. Edwards Middle School Band, Of Pickens County, For Capturing The Outstanding Concert Band Award At The Presidential Inaugural Heritage Band Festival, Held On January 18, 2009, In Baltimore, Maryland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-03 | Introduced and adopted HJ-2 |
Same As/Similar To
S0646 (Similar To) 2009-03-31 - Introduced and adopted SJ-10
H3400 (Similar To) 2009-02-03 - Introduced and adopted HJ-3
H3400 (Similar To) 2009-02-03 - Introduced and adopted HJ-3
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3399&session=118 |