SC H3396 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-15 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That An Employee Covered By The Longshore And Harbor Workers' Compensation Act, Or Any Of Its Extensions, Or The Merchant Marine Act Is Exempt From Workers' Compensation Laws.
Title
Workers' Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 84 N: 24 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-04-15 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-84 Nays-24 |
2015-04-14 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-14 | House | Amended |
2015-04-14 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: Clary |
2015-03-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-14-15 |
2015-03-24 | House | Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-26-15 |
2015-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-03-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Ryhal, Hardee |
2015-03-09 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: McCoy |
2015-03-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Corley |
2015-02-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Horne, Bedingfield, Hamilton, Finlay, Merrill, Whitmire, Crosby, Hardwick, Duckworth, Allison, V.S.Moss, Norman, Quinn, Limehouse, Atwater, Willis, Spires, Sottile, Herbkersman, G.R.Smith, Clemmons, Henderson, Loftis, Taylor, McCoy, Murphy, Tallon, Brannon, Erickson, Toole, Clary, Wells, D.C.Moss |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0016 (Similar To) 2015-02-27 - Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory (ch), Bright, Coleman, Bennett, Shealy, Turner, Kimpson