SC H3393 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Article 11 To Chapter 31, Title 23 So As To Provide It Is Unlawful For Financial Institutions Or Governmental Entities To Discriminate Against Certain Manufacturers And Retailers Of Firearms, Firearm Accessories, Or Ammunition, And To Provide Penalties.
Title
Firearms
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Taylor [R] | Rep. John Mccravy [R] | Rep. John West [R] | Rep. James Burns [R] |
Rep. Jordan Pace [R] | Rep. Matthew Leber [R] | Rep. Tom Hartnett [R] | Rep. Anne Thayer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer |
2023-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Leber, Hartnett |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3393&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3393_20221208.htm |