SC H3365 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Scrivener's error corrected
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Scrivener's error corrected
Summary
A BILL TO ENACT THE "HIGHER EDUCATION EFFICIENCY AND ADMINISTRATIVE POLICIES ACT".
Title
A Bill To Enact The "higher Education Efficiency And Administrative Policies Act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-09 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-23 | |
2010-02-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education SJ-8 | |
2009-05-07 | Committed to Committee on Education SJ-9 | |
2009-05-07 | Recalled from Committee on Finance SJ-9 | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Subcommittee: Courson (ch), Elliott, Verdin, Jackson | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Finance SJ-19 | |
2009-04-14 | Introduced and read first time SJ-19 | |
2009-04-02 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-14 | |
2009-04-01 | Read second time HJ-66 | |
2009-04-01 | Amended HJ-47 | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means HJ-14 | |
2009-02-12 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: J.R.Smith | |
2009-02-10 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: T.R.Young | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-14 | |
2009-01-28 | Introduced and read first time HJ-14 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3365&session=118 |