SC H3359 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Recalled from House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 56-1-151 So As To Provide That An Applicant For A Driver's License May Apply To Obtain A Veteran Designation On His Driver's License; And To Amend Section 56-1-3350, Relating To The Issuance Of Special Identification Cards And Drivers' Licenses That Contain A Veteran Designation, So As To Delete The Provision That Provides That An Applicant For A Driver's License May Apply To Obtain A Veteran Designation On His Driver's License.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's license

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23SenateRecalled from House
2020-09-23HousePursuant to Rule 4.8, Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-09-23SenateRoll call Ayes-34 Nays-0
2020-09-23SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2020-09-23SenateAmended
2020-09-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-09-22SenateRead second time
2020-09-22SenateRecalled from Committee on Transportation
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-02-13HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-02-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-12HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseAmended
2019-02-12HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: R.Williams
2019-02-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
561151(n/a)See Bill Text
5613350(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3359&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3359_20181218.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3359_20190207.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3359_20190208.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3359_20190212.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3359_20190213.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3359_20200922.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3359_20200923.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3359_20200923A.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15639
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=18014

Bill Comments

feedback