SC H3357 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Campbell, Johnson, Climer
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That The Department Of Motor Vehicles May Add A Notation To A Private Passenger-carrying Motor Vehicle Registration To Indicate The Vehicle Owner May Be Deaf Or Hard Of Hearing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle registration, private passenger-carrying vehicle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 34) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateSenate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Campbell, Johnson, Climer
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-0 Nays-109
2019-05-09HouseNon-concurrence in Senate amendment
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRoll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
2019-05-07SenateRead second time
2019-05-07SenateAmended
2019-04-24SenateCommittee report: Favorable Transportation
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-03-20SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-20HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-19HouseRoll call Yeas-83 Nays-0
2019-03-19HouseRead second time
2019-03-19HouseAmended
2019-03-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2019-03-06HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon
2019-02-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor
2019-02-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
2019-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Brawley
2019-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Collins
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0294 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
H4391 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
563115(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3357&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3357_20181218.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3357_20190307.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3357_20190319.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3357_20190424.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3357_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3357_20190508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3357_20190508A.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16120
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16647
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16829

Bill Comments

feedback