SC H3355 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-12 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-12 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Main Street Extension, From Rembert C. Dennis Boulevard To U.s. Highway 52 In Moncks Corner, And S.c. Highway 6, From U.s. Highway 52 To Ranger Drive In Cross, The “john Trout Memorial Highway” And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Highway Containing This Designation.
Title
John Trout Memorial Intersection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-21 | House | Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0 |
2017-03-21 | House | Concurred in amendment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-14 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |