SC H3352 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: McCravy
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: McCravy
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 42-17-15 So As To Provide Workers' Compensation Settlement Agreements Are Unenforceable To The Extent That They Are Conditioned Upon The Release Of Certain Legal Claims By The Injured Employee Or His Dependents; And To Provide The Offer Of Settlement Agreements That Include Such Conditions Constitutes Bad Faith Per Se.
Title
Workers' Comp settlement agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | House | Member(s) request name removed as sponsor: McCravy |
2019-01-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCravy |
2019-01-15 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bernstein |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-12-18 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3352&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3352_20181218.htm |