SC H3352 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-95
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reapportion The Specific Election Districts From Which Members Of The Jasper County Board Of Education Must Be Elected Beginning With School Board Elections In 2016, And To Provide For Demographic Information In Regard To These Newly Drawn Election Districts.
Title
Jasper County Board of Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 57) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 57) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-95 |
2015-03-18 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2015-03-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Recalled from delegation Jasper County |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committed to delegation from Jasper County |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-02-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-02-04 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-02-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-65 Nays-0 |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Jasper Delegation |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to Jasper Delegation |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3303 (Similar To) 2015-02-18 - Committed to delegation from Jasper County