SC H3347 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

An Amendment To Section 36, Article Iii Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Relating To The General Reserve Fund, So As To Provide That The General Reserve Fund Of Five Percent Of General Fund Revenue Of The Latest Completed Fiscal Year Must Be Increased Each Year By One-half Of One Percent Of The General Fund Revenue Of The Latest Completed Fiscal Year Until It Equals Seven Percent Of Such Revenues; And Proposing An Amendment To Section 36, Article Iii Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, 1895, Also Relating To The Capital Reserve Fund So As To Provide That The Capital Reserve Fund Of Two Percent Of General Fund Revenue Of The Latest Completed Fiscal Year Must Be Increased To Three Percent Of General Fund Revenue Of The Latest Completed Fiscal Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Reserve Fund and Capital Reserve Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-23 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-24SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2022-02-24SenateIntroduced and read first time
2022-02-24HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2022-02-23HouseRoll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
2022-02-23HouseRead second time
2022-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: M.M.Smith, Weeks
2022-02-22HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2021-03-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gagnon, Hyde, West, Thayer, Ligon
2021-01-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Bennett
2021-01-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: G.M.Smith
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-12-09HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S1106 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Conference committee appointed Peeler, Setzler, Alexander

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback