SC H3346 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Effective date 05/13/19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revise The Filing Period For Declarations Of Candidacy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chesterfield County School District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Effective date 05/13/19
2019-05-13 Signed By Governor
2019-05-09 Ratified R 57
2019-05-08SenateRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-02SenateRead second time
2019-04-09SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-05HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-04HouseUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2019-04-04HouseRoll call Yeas-94 Nays-0
2019-04-04HouseRead second time
2019-04-03HouseRecalled from Chesterfield Delegation
2019-03-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Lucas, Henegan
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Chesterfield Delegation
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Chesterfield Delegation
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback