SC H3333 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 14-1-206, AS AMENDED, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO ADDITIONAL ASSESSMENTS IMPOSED BY GENERAL SESSIONS COURTS, SO AS TO PROVIDE AN AMOUNT TO THE SOUTH CAROLINA CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACADEMY; AND TO AMEND SECTION 14-1-207, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO ADDITIONAL ASSESSMENTS IMPOSED BY MAGISTRATES COURTS, SO AS TO PROVIDE AN AMOUNT TO THE SOUTH CAROLINA CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACADEMY.
Title
Provide An Amount To The South Carolina Criminal Justice Academy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-8 | |
2009-02-19 | Introduced and read first time SJ-8 | |
2009-02-19 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-19 | |
2009-02-18 | Read second time HJ-28 | |
2009-02-11 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary HJ-4 | |
2009-02-04 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: T.R.Young | |
2009-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-15 | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced and read first time HJ-15 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3333&session=118 |