SC H3332 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Certain Definitions, Subject Premium Rates Charged For Liability And Collision Coverage To Certain Driver Training Course Credits For A Driver Who Is A Youthful Operator, And Provide Other Conditions Concerning The Credits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automobile insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-15 Act No. 7
2011-04-14 Effective date See Act for Effective Date
2011-04-12 Signed By Governor
2011-04-06 Ratified R 23
2011-03-10 Read third time and enrolled
2011-03-09 Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2011-03-09 Read second time
2011-02-24 Scrivener's error corrected
2011-02-23 Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
2011-02-15 Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2011-02-15 Introduced and read first time
2011-02-10 Read third time and sent to Senate
2011-02-09 Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
2011-02-09 Read second time
2011-02-08 Requests for debate-Rep
2011-02-08 Amended
2011-02-03 Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons
2011-02-02 Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2011-02-02 Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bowers, Bales, Anderson, Pinson
2011-01-18 Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2011-01-18 Introduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3873736(n/a)See Bill Text
3873737(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback