SC H3318 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-21 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Timmons
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-21 - Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Timmons
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establish The Illegal Immigration Enforcement Unit Within The State Law Enforcement Division; To Repeal Section 23-6-60 Relating To The Illegal Immigration Enforcement Unit Established Within The Department Of Public Safety; And To Transfer All The Associated Employees, Authorized Appropriations, Assets, And Liabilities.
Title
Illegal Immigration Unit
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Pitts [R] | Rep. Garry Smith [R] | Rep. Steven Long [R] | Rep. Edward Tallon [R] |
Rep. McLain Toole [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 20 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Timmons |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-24 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-23 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-5 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Toole |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2017-03-02 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-02 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |