SC H3313 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 30-5-10, Relating To The Performance Of The Duties Of A Register Of Deeds, So As To Add Florence County To The Counties Exempt From The Requirement That These Duties Be Performed By The Clerk Of Court; And By Amending Section 30-5-12, Relating To The Appointment Of The Register Of Deeds For Certain Counties, So As To Add Florence County To The Counties Where The Governing Body Of The County Appoints The Register Of Deeds.
Title
Florence County Register of Deeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: M.Johnson (ch), Sabb, Talley, Adams, Devine |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-04-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Read second time |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |