SC H3312 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #9) [HTML]

Summary

Create The "child Food And Nutrition Services Study Committee", To Provide For The Purposes And Membership Of The Study Committee, To Require The Study Committee Prepare A Report With Findings And Recommendations For The General Assembly, And To Provide For The Dissolution Of The Study Committee. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Food and Nutrition Services Study Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-06 Act No. 89
2023-04-27 Effective date 04/25/23
2023-04-25 Signed By Governor
2023-04-19 Ratified R 13
2023-03-29HouseRoll call Yeas-111 Nays-0
2023-03-29HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2023-03-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-03-23SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2023-03-23 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-03-22SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-1
2023-03-22SenateRead second time
2023-03-22SenateAmended
2023-03-15SenateCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2023-02-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2023-02-08HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2023-02-07HouseRoll call Yeas-113 Nays-0
2023-02-07HouseRead second time
2023-02-07HouseAmended
2023-02-07HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Williams
2023-02-01HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2023-01-31HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2023-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2022-12-08HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2022-12-08HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3312&session=125&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3312_20221208.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3312_20230201.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3312_20230207.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3312_20230315.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3312_20230322.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3312_20230323.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3312_20230327.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3312_20230328.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3312_20230207A.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/fiscalimpactstatements/H3312%202023-01-10%20introduced.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21892
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=22579
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=22615

Bill Comments

feedback