SC H3312 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-27 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-11
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-01-27 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-11
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND ACT 314 OF 2000, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE SOUTH CAROLINA COMMUNITY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT ACT, SO AS TO TERMINATE THE PROVISIONS OF THE SOUTH CAROLINA COMMUNITY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT ACT ON JUNE 30, 2015, INSTEAD OF JUNE 30, 2010; AND TO DEEM OTHER LAWS, REGULATIONS, AND OTHER PROVISIONS IN CONNECTION WITH THE ACT REPEALED ON THAT DATE.
Title
Terminate The Provisions Of The South Carolina Community Economic Development Act On June 30, 2015, Instead Of June 30, 2010; And To Deem Other Laws, Regulations, And Other Provisions In Connection With The Act Repealed On That Date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-27 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means HJ-11 | |
2009-01-27 | Introduced and read first time HJ-11 |
Same As/Similar To
S0915 (Similar To) -
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3312&session=118 |