SC H3288 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Sections 16-3-100 And 16-3-110 So As To Create The Offenses Of Homicide And Great Bodily Injury By Fentanyl, Morphine, Methamphetamine, Or Heroin, Respectively, To Provide Penalties, And To Define Necessary Terms.
Title
Homicide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2022-01-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Long, Haddon, Morgan |
2021-01-13 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Caskey |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3288&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/3288_20201209.htm |