SC H3279 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorize The Department Of Health And Human Services To Make Arrangements For All Medicaid Programs Offered Through Managed Care Plans Or Fee-for-service Programs To Require The Dispensing Of Contraceptive Drugs With A Twelve-month Supply Provided At One Time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell
2019-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway
2019-01-17HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0187 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3871120(n/a)See Bill Text
446120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback