SC H3247 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-13
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-13
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 27-40-445 SO AS TO PROVIDE A LANDLORD OF A MULTI-FAMILY DWELLING MAY EMPLOY CERTAIN EQUIPMENT OR METHODOLOGY TO DETERMINE THE QUANTITY OF WATER PROVIDED TO EACH SINGLE-FAMILY RESIDENCE WITHIN THE DWELLING, AND TO PROVIDE THE LANDLORD MAY CHARGE A TENANT FOR WATER AND WASTEWATER USED BY HIS SINGLE-FAMILY RESIDENCE, AND TO PROVIDE EXCEPTIONS; TO AMEND SECTION 27-40-210, RELATING TO GENERAL DEFINITIONS IN THE RESIDENTIAL LANDLORD AND TENANT ACT, SO AS TO DEFINE A MULTI-FAMILY DWELLING; AND TO AMEND SECTION 27-40-440, RELATING TO A LANDLORD'S OBLIGATIONS, SO AS TO PROVIDE SPECIFIC REQUIREMENTS PERTAINING TO THE PROVISION OF CENTRAL HEAT AND HOT WATER TO A MULTI-FAMILY DWELLING.
Title
Provide Specific Requirements Pertaining To The Provision Of Central Heat And Hot Water To A Multi-family Dwelling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-03 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-13 | |
2009-03-03 | Introduced and read first time SJ-13 | |
2009-02-27 | Read third time and sent to Senate HJ-3 | |
2009-02-26 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-138 | |
2009-02-26 | Roll call Yeas-65 Nays-0 HJ-138 | |
2009-02-26 | Read second time HJ-138 | |
2009-02-24 | Requests for debate-Rep(s). King, Rutherford, Sellers, Kennedy, Ott, Hosey, Clyburn, Hart, Bales, Sandifer, Clemmons, JH Neal, Williams, Dillard, Mitchell, Mack, Erickson, and R Brown HJ-33 | |
2009-02-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-02-18 | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-6 | |
2009-01-15 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-441 | |
2009-01-15 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary HJ-441 | |
2009-01-14 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duncan | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-101 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-101 |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 40 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 40 | 440 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
27 | 40 | 445 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3247&session=118 |