SC H3243 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revise And Further Provide For Various Filing Fees, Including A Flat Fee For Various Documents

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Filing and recording fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 58 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-14 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-13 Ratified R 78
2019-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
2019-05-09HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2019-05-09SenateRoll call Ayes-36 Nays-3
2019-05-09SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2019-05-09SenateAmended
2019-05-08SenateRead second time
2019-05-08SenateAmended
2019-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-07SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-04-30SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Climer, Goldfinch
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-26SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-26HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-03-20HouseRoll call Yeas-97 Nays-5
2019-03-20HouseRead second time
2019-03-20HouseAmended
2019-03-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon
2019-03-19HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-03-06HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-19-19
2019-03-05HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 3-6-19
2019-03-05HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2019-03-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Clemmons
2019-02-28HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 3-5-19
2019-02-28 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-02-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry
2019-02-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
821310(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3243&session=123&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3243_20181218.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3243_20190227.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3243_20190228.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3243_20190320.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3243_20190507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3243_20190508A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3243_20190509.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3243_20190509A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/3243_20190508.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16153
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16154
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16783
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=16853

Bill Comments

feedback