SC H3233 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Member
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Make Application To The Congress Of The United States To Call A Convention For Proposing Amendments Pursuant To Article V Of The United States Constitution Limited To Proposing Amendments That Impose Fiscal Restraints On The Federal Government, Limit The Power And Jurisdiction Of The Federal Government, And Limit The Terms Of Office For Its Officials And For Members Of Congress; To Provide Certain Reservations, Understandings, And Declarations Limiting The Application; And To Provide Certain Selection Criteria For Commissioners As Well As Limitations Upon Their Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Application to U.S. Congress

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29HouseMember
2017-03-02HouseMember
2017-02-02HouseMember
2017-01-24HouseMember
2017-01-19HouseMember
2017-01-18HouseMember
2017-01-18HouseMember
2017-01-12HouseMember
2017-01-11HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback