SC H3218 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require Annual Reporting To The Department By Dam Or Reservoir Owners Of Certain Owner Contact And Other Information, Together With A Completed Owner Checklist, And To Require The Owners Of Dams Or Reservoirs Classified As A High Or Significant Hazard Annually To Provide A Current Emergency Action Plan Including Contact Information Of Specified Officials, Downstream Residents, And Business Owners.
Title
Dams and Reservoirs Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Lucas [R] | Rep. Davey Hiott [R] | Rep. Steve Moss [R] | Rep. Michael Pitts [R] |
Rep. John West [R] | Rep. William Crosby [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-02-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-02-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-3 |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | House | Amended |
2017-02-01 | House | Objection withdrawn by Rep. Lowe |
2017-01-31 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-18 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Crosby |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2016-12-15 | House | Prefiled |