SC H3213 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Law Enforcement Officer Who Suspects That A Motor Vehicle Accident Was The Result Of A Driver's Loss Of Consciousness Due To A Medical Condition Must Notify The Department Of Motor Vehicles Of This Determination And To Provide That The Department Shall Promulgate Regulations To Implement The Provisions Contained In This Section.
Title
Auto accidents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2015-02-18 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Committee report: Favorable Education and Public Works |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2014-12-18 | House | Prefiled |