SC H3209 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Act No. 254
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Immunity For Employers Who Hire Persons Whose Criminal Records Have Been Expunged

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expungement of criminal records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-12 Act No. 254
2018-07-05 Effective date See Act
2018-06-27SenateVeto overridden Ayes-35 Nays-5
2018-06-27HouseVeto overridden by originating body Yeas-108 Nays-1
2018-05-19 Vetoed by Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 237
2018-05-10HouseRoll call Yeas-83 Nays-13
2018-05-10HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2018-05-10HouseReconsidered amendments to Senate amendments
2018-05-10HouseRecalled from Senate
2018-05-10HouseReturned to Senate with amendments
2018-05-10HouseSenate amendment amended
2018-05-10SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-2
2018-05-10SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2018-05-10SenateAmended
2018-05-10SenateReconsider vote whereby read third time and returned with amendments
2018-05-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-05-10SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-2
2018-05-10SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2018-05-10SenateAmended
2018-05-09SenateRead second time
2018-05-09SenateAmended
2017-05-03SenateCommittee report: Favorable Judiciary
2017-04-18SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Malloy, Shealy, Rice, Timmons
2017-04-11SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-11SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-04-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2017-04-06HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2017-04-05HouseRoll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
2017-04-05HouseRead second time
2017-04-05HouseAmended
2017-04-05HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan, Henegan, Dillard, Gilliard
2017-04-04HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 4-5-17
2017-04-04HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2017-04-04HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: King, Magnuson, Norrell, Martin, B.Newton, Long
2017-03-30HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper, Brown, M.Rivers
2017-03-29HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2017-01-18HouseMember
2017-01-12HouseMember
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2016-12-15HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2016-12-15HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1722910(n/a)See Bill Text
1722940(n/a)See Bill Text
1722960(n/a)See Bill Text
225910(n/a)See Bill Text
225920(n/a)See Bill Text
225930(n/a)See Bill Text
63192050(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3209&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3209_20161215.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3209_20170329.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3209_20170405.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3209_20170406.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3209_20170503.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3209_20180509.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3209_20180510.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/3209_20180510A.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=13077
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15304
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15225
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15333
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15331

Bill Comments

feedback