SC H3206 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: King
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibit The Possession, Distribution, Or Manufacture Of A Device, Part, Component, Attachment, Or Accessory Intended To Accelerate The Rate Of Fire Of A Semiautomatic Firearm, Including A Device Commonly Known As A Bump Stock Or Trigger Crank, To Provide A Penalty For A Violation Of This Section And To Allow Exceptions Under Certain Circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: King
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3240 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cogswell

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1623210(n/a)See Bill Text
1623220(n/a)See Bill Text
1623230(n/a)See Bill Text
1623240(n/a)See Bill Text
1623540(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback