SC H3205 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Delete A Contrary Provision

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Catawba Tribe

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Signed By Governor
2019-05-13 Ratified R 77
2019-05-09SenateRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-1
2019-05-08SenateRead second time
2019-05-02SenateRecalled from Committee on Finance
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-04-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2019-04-09HouseRoll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
2019-04-09HouseRead second time
2019-04-04HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 4-9-19
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-18HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2018-12-18HousePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2716130(n/a)See Bill Text
2716150(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback