SC H3204 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Create The South Carolina Summer Camp Study Committee To Study The Summer Camps In The State And Make Recommendations To The Legislature Related To Licensing And Regulation Of Summer Camps, Provide For The Membership And Method Of Appointment For The Membership, Provide For The Duties Of The Study Committee, Provide For The Staffing Of The Study Committee, And To Dissolve The Study Committee After A Report Of Its Findings Is Provided To The Legislature And The Governor.
Title
South Carolina Summer Camp Study Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2011-02-24 | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-02-01 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Butler Garrick | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-14 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works | |
2010-12-14 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0295 (Similar To) 2012-02-22 - Debate adjourned until Thur., 03-08-12
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3204&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/3204_20101214.htm |