SC H3197 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Long
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Long
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The Department Of Juvenile Justice To Grant Probationers And Parolees Under The Department's Supervision Up To A Ten-day Reduction Of The Probationary Or Parole Term For Each Month They Are Compliant With The Terms And Conditions Of Their Probation Or Parole.
Title
Department of Juvenile Justice
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Brady [R] | Rep. Shannon Erickson [R] | Rep. Deborah Long [R] | Sen. Maymia McLeod [D] |
Rep. Kit Spires [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Long | |
2011-02-01 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Butler Garrick | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-14 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-14 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0303 (Similar To) 2011-03-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Campsen, Coleman, Davis, Nicholson
H3196 (Similar To) 2011-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Long
S0302 (Similar To) 2012-03-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3196 (Similar To) 2011-03-02 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Long
S0302 (Similar To) 2012-03-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3197&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/3197_20101214.htm |