SC H3196 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duncan
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Introduced on January 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duncan
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 2-19-80, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE PROCESS OF DETERMINING JUDICIAL CANDIDATES BY THE JUDICIAL MERIT SELECTION COMMISSION, SO AS TO REMOVE THE LIMITATION THAT THE COMMISSION MAY NOMINATE ONLY THREE CANDIDATES, AND TO REQUIRE THAT THE COMMISSION INSTEAD RELEASE A LIST OF THE NAMES OF ALL CANDIDATES THE COMMISSION FINDS QUALIFIED FOR OFFICE.
Title
Remove The Limitation That The Commission May Nominate Only Three Candidates, And To Require That The Commission Instead Release A List Of The Names Of All Candidates The Commission Finds Qualified For Office.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R] | Rep. James Harrison [R] | Rep. James Merrill [R] | Rep. Michael Pitts [R] |
Rep. David Umphlett [R] | Rep. Ted Vick [D] | Rep. Annette Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Duncan | |
2009-01-27 | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Vick | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-85 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-85 | |
2008-12-16 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2008-12-16 | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=3196&session=118 |